Accounts and annual returns AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1175858
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 01 September 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 01 September 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 20 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 14 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 15 September 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 15 September 2019 15 days late Download Open in new window