Trustees AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1175858
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Ruark-Davis Trustee 08 February 2021
None on record
Yasmine Zolfaghari-Nia Trustee 16 December 2020
AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Noorzia Aimaq Trustee 16 December 2020
AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Sayed Hadi Sina Trustee 07 June 2020
None on record
Maria Mahmoodi Karimzad Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Paul Lehmann Trustee 30 November 2019
None on record