2ND CHANZI MOBILE HUB

Charity number: 1174016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 May 2020 18 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 May 2020 18 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 18 May 2019 23 September 2020 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 May 2019 23 September 2020 189 days late Download
Annual return 18 May 2018 21 September 2020 553 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 May 2018 21 September 2020 553 days late Download