Accounts and annual returns CENTRAL COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510287
Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 November 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 197 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 March 2021 139 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 January 2020 88 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window