Financial history CENTRAL COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510287
Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £198.67k £194.99k £182.65k £161.61k £117.41k
Total expenditure £181.44k £185.69k £184.50k £204.74k £139.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £53.33k