Accounts and annual returns DITCHINGHAM MEN'S SHED

Charity number: 1173804
Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 August 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 September 2023 91 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 December 2022 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 December 2022 154 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 August 2023 765 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 05 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window