LINTHORPE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £22.80k £21.99k £21.44k £23.52k £12.14k
Total expenditure £21.65k £18.63k £21.18k £25.67k £18.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A