SLAIDBURN SILVER BAND

Charity number: 510302
Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.47k £2.87k £3.27k £1.81k £2.07k
Total expenditure £3.20k £5.21k £2.88k £1.75k £1.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A