SHOE AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shoe Aid is a footwear charity that collects and redistributes unused, used and unwanted footwear throughout the UK. Our aim is to reduce shoe poverty and reduce the impact on the environment from shoes sent as waste to landfill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Hughes | Chair | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH AITKEN | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
BARRY ANTHONY BEAUMONT | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMY JANE NOAKES | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.47k | £26.01k | £19.64k | £12.41k | £24.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.92k | £33.08k | £23.04k | £10.05k | £21.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 30 April 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 30 April 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE IN POVERTY/ HOMELESS IN THE UK BY PROVIDING SHOES TO THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED OF THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beech Avenue
Basford
Nottingham
NG7 7LS
- Phone:
- 07511 983508
- Email:
- info@shoeaid.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window