Accounts and annual returns NEW LIFE IN CHRIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1174303
Charity reporting is overdue by 742 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 376 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 376 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 742 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 742 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 June 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 08 June 2022 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 June 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 07 June 2021 38 days late Download Open in new window