Accounts and annual returns THE LEARNING STATION PROJECT

Charity number: 1175797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 01 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 June 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 15 June 2020 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window