Accounts and annual returns BRAMBLES CHILDCARE

Charity number: 1175924
Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 30 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 09 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 October 2021 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 20 October 2021 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 March 2021 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 24 March 2021 297 days late Download Open in new window