BRAMBLES CHILDCARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brambles Childcare offers wraparound care for children aged 3 to 11 and Playgroup for children aged 2 to 4. We have use of the adjoining school's facilities at designated times. We offer a wide range of activities to ensure the child's social, intellectual, physical and emotional needs are catered for. Our childcare activities are designed to encourage learning through play/firsthand experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 27 November 2017: CIO registration
- FUN CLUB (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Francis Matthews | Chair | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hender | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Teressa Russell | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £125.09k | £141.56k | £167.64k | £187.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £126.04k | £141.76k | £152.83k | £190.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £70.17k | £3.93k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 October 2024 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 October 2024 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 297 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRAMBLES CHILDCARE CIO
St Helen's Primary School
Bluntisham
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE28 3NY
- Phone:
- 01487843466
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window