TOPSHAM RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Club are to promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for playing rugby union football and other sports which involve physical or mental skill or exertion; and to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for sport, recreation or other leisure time occupation of such persons who have need for such facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 18 September 2017: CIO registration
- 22 October 2020: Funds received from 1146890 TOPSHAM RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Cottle | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Oxland | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Robert Francis Deasy | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Philip David Dixie | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hawley | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Freyja Wilkinson | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Stewart | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mercedes Osborne | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Katie Sarah Lunnon | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ron Murray | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.21k | £205.85k | £168.80k | £156.32k | £242.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.45k | £86.46k | £129.26k | £216.73k | £197.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS WHICH INVOLVE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SKILL OR EXERTION ("FACILITIES" MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); AND 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOPSHAM RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB
EXETER ROAD
TOPSHAM
EXETER
EX3 0LY
- Phone:
- 01392873651
- Email:
- charity@topshamrugby.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window