Accounts and annual returns BRIGHT FUTURE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1175445
Charity reporting is overdue by 141 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2021 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2021 359 days late Download Open in new window