Ventnor Friends of Wight Horticulture

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote education in botany, horticulture, ecology and environmental science on the Isle of Wight. We stimulate interest and advance knowledge through organizing events including talks, walks, outings and workshops. Where possible, we provide support for students pursuing a career in horticulture and for appropriate projects in parks and gardens which advance mental and physical health
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 20 September 2017: CIO registration
- 31 October 2020: Funds received from 1080835 VENTNOR BOTANIC GARDEN FRIENDS' SOCIETY
- VENTNOR BOTANIC GARDEN FRIENDS' SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Jean Pitts | Chair | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Jane Parker | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy William Woodcock | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.50k | £23.17k | £31.34k | £17.55k | £17.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.82k | £44.91k | £34.73k | £15.90k | £18.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 20 SEP 2017 AMENDED ON 12 DEC 2024 as amended on 12 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN BOTANY, HORTICULTURE, ECOLOGY AND ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE ACROSS THE ISLE OF WIGHT, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) STIMULATING INTEREST AND ADVANCING KNOWLEDGE THROUGH A VARIETY OF EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES INCLUDING WALKS, TALKS, OUTINGS AND WORKSHOPS (B) SUPPORTING STUDENTS IN PURSUING A CAREER IN HORTICULTURE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY AWARDING GRANTS (C) SUPPORTING APPROPRIATE PROJECTS OR INITIATIVES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING IN PARKS AND GARDENS IN VENTNOR AND ELSEWHERE ON THE ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Cottage
Upper Green Road
St. Helens
RYDE
Isle Of Wight
PO33 1UQ
- Phone:
- 01983 872519
- Email:
- chairman@vfwh.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window