Accounts and annual returns MAUR

Charity number: 1175284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 01 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 29 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 April 2021 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 April 2021 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 September 2020 210 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 16 April 2021 436 days late Download Open in new window