THE SALFORD STROKE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a group of people mainly 60-70+ age group who have had a stroke, their carers and volunteers. We meet once a month on the first tuesday of each month except January from 7.30 - 10 pm. There are approx 30 members & we always hold a social evening, entertainment, music, bingo etc. The members all take part & thoroughly enjoy meeting all their friends & volunteers each month. Transport is prov
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
- Salford City
Governance
- 01 September 1980: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA REDFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JAMES DOHERTY | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN LIGHTFOOT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIEN BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35k | £0 | £1.53k | £1.52k | £1.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £186 | £1.82k | £2.01k | £1.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MAY 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM STROKES IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF SALFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 SANDWICH ROAD
ECCLES
MANCHESTER
M30 9HD
- Phone:
- 01617893811
- Email:
- colin.barlow@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window