Trustees DYSPRAXIC ME

Charity number: 1175961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JESS STARNS Chair 11 June 2017
LITTLE GREEN PIG
Received: On time
David Brown Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Daniela Spenippo Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record
Richard Nicholas Trustee 24 November 2021
FREE TO BE KIDS
Received: On time
Rosemary Richings Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Louise Claire McAward-White Trustee 17 May 2020
DACORUM HERITAGE TRUST LTD
Received: On time