Accounts and annual returns KENT ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1176989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window