THE BUST TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of physical and mental health and well-being of girls and women in all aspects of breast health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 October 2017: Standard registration
- THE BUST PROJECT (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ANTHONY POWER | Chair | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW DAVID CHENERY | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 APR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO): 3.1 THE PROMOTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF GIRLS AND WOMEN IN ALL ASPECTS OF BREAST HEALTH; AND 3.2 THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN BREAST HEALTH FOR GIRLS AND WOMEN AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN ALL AREAS OF GENERAL BREAST HEALTH FOR GIRLS AND WOMEN AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Drake House Crescent
Waterthorpe
SHEFFIELD
S20 7HT
- Phone:
- 01132446100
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window