BOSTON UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1174561
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 August 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 14 August 2020 106 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download