Accounts and annual returns ENGLISH MARTYRS LEICESTER DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1176648
Charity reporting is overdue by 78 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 78 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 78 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 April 2023 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 April 2023 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 May 2021 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 May 2021 96 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 June 2020 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 June 2020 135 days late Download Open in new window