Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF NEWCASTLE ST LUKE CHURCH, NEWCASTLE-UPON-TYNE
Charity number: 1174238

Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David McRae | Chair | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Florence Douglas | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen McIlveen | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gayle Seymour | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Simpson | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Dawson | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Keates | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne McRae | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Morris | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.