YORK CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1176094
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download