Accounts and annual returns REBOOT THE FUTURE

Charity number: 1175117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window