Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY DE HAURA, NEW SHOREHAM
Charity number: 1174718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Mark Kinsey Bennison | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jane Louise Bartlett | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Rathbone | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN TOMPKIN | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Louise Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Josephine Claire Johnson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Clay | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE CLARK | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Robertson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stephen Davies | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Evan John Tyson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Allinson | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Payne | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Downes | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sayers | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE GILL | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN SMITH | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK POTTER | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.