Accounts and annual returns RIPLEY OLD AGE PENSIONERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required