AGE CONCERN EASINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity operates from 65 Seaside Lane Easington Colliery SR8 3PG. The following activities operate from our premises: Coffee Mornings Monday - Friday 9 - 12 noon T Dance in Welfare Hall - Tuesday 1.30 - 3.30 pm Craft Group- Tuesday 7 - 9pm Craft Class 1 - 3pm on Thursday Art Class, Copper Foiling group 1 - 3pm on Friday
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 18 October 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN BISHOP | Chair | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS VICKER | Trustee | 02 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
YVETTE O'DONNEL | Trustee | 02 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Payne | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY BROWN | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DORA FRASER | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIZ MUSGRAVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT MOSES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.63k | £10.84k | £2.39k | £5.55k | £1.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.40k | £2.87k | £3.92k | £3.72k | £5.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JUNE 1979
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ORGANISATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF AGED AND HANDICAPPED PERSONS IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE EASINGTON DISTRICT(HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT")
Area of benefit
EASINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Glenhurst Road
Peterlee
SR8 3HD
- Phone:
- 01915273395
- Email:
- doryfras@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window