BRITAIN ALXAS COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND MIGRANTS OF TURKISH AND KURDISH DESCENT BY PREVENTING SUCH PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUSA BEKISOGLU | Chair | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAZIM KILIC | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
TACIM KAYA | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.73k | £180.03k | £318.00k | £325.88k | £351.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.34k | £153.94k | £285.00k | £290.46k | £350.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 299 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2022 | 318 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2022 | 318 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED ON 01 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND MIGRANTS OF TURKISH AND KURDISH DESCENT BY PREVENTING SUCH PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES SUCH PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; B) INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCH PEOPLE TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE; AND C) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING, INCLUDING ENGLISH LANGUAGE SKILLS, AND ADVICE AND SUPPORT ON MATTERS SUCH AS HEALTH, HOUSING AND EMPLOYMENT AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE THEM TO INTEGRATE AND ADAPT TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 2) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LONDON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE OF TURKISH AND KURDISH DESCENT, BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Bull Lane
LONDON
N18 1SX
- Phone:
- 07904242683
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window