Accounts and annual returns RIBCHESTER MUSEUM OF ROMAN ANTIQUITIES

Charity number: 510490
Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 March 2022 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 September 2020 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 September 2020 220 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 May 2019 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 May 2019 98 days late Download Open in new window