Accounts and annual returns CITYHILL LONDON

Charity number: 1175557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 September 2019 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 06 September 2019 68 days late Download Open in new window