Accounts and annual returns SWANSEA SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window