SOCIAL MOBILITY BUSINESS PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SMBP is dedicated to broadening access to businesses, by providing students from low income backgrounds access to work insight with multiple employers, resilience training and lifetime career mentoring. The SMBP Delivery model has been developed to encourage collaboration not competition between organisations across the world of business and the wider third sector by providing the operational back
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
750 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW SHELDON GARARD | Chair | 18 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Garratt Hipperson | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Alan James Edmiston | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Francis | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Ewart Robertson | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Lawson | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Russell Ian Johnstone | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Joanne Stella Maria Theodoulou | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Carole Mehigan | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES ELVIN | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN GOLD | Trustee | 18 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND JEREMY BERG | Trustee | 18 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £257.71k | £230.85k | £217.88k | £227.37k | £276.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.53k | £203.64k | £184.98k | £231.94k | £273.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE FROM LOW INCOME BACKGROUNDS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: PROVIDING AND FACILITATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO OBTAIN WORK EXPERIENCE WITH ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN OR WITH THE PROFESSIONS OF LAW AND ACCOUNTANCY, AND SUCH OTHER PROFESSIONS AND FIELDS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT; AND ADVISING AND ASSISTING THEM TO ACHIEVE THE NECESSARY QUALIFICATIONS AND TO ENTER AND PROGRESS IN CAREERS IN SUCH PROFESSIONS AND FIELDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Osborne Clarke Llp
1 London Wall
LONDON
EC2Y 5EB
- Phone:
- 07885549247
- Email:
- info@smbp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window