Accounts and annual returns PEMBROKESHIRE CARE SHARE & GIVE

Charity number: 1175646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required