WINCHESTER AND DISTRICT BRANCH OF SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To enable persons in Winchester & the surrounding area, as well as elsewhere, who are experiencing feelings of distress or despair, including those who may be at risk of suicide, to receive confidential emotional support at any time of day or night in order to improve their emotional health and to reduce the incidence of suicide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £40,507
Total expenditure: £60,040

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WAYNE FLETCHER Chair 09 September 2021
None on record
Stephen Allen Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
CHRISTOPHER WASHINGTON-SARE Trustee 20 March 2023
None on record
William Michael Giles Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
Peter Walker Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
ANNE PENELOPE DIVER Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
HILARY SUSAN BYFORD Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.52k £51.92k £37.86k £51.20k £40.51k
Total expenditure £66.70k £63.24k £58.87k £72.42k £60.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.60k £2.90k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD APRIL 1985 AS AMENDED 29TH APRIL 1992 AND 26 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN WINCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
WINCHESTER
Registration history
  • 22 November 1991 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Treasurer
Winchester Samaritans
13 Upper High Street
Winchester
SO23 8UT
Phone:
01962852555