Accounts and annual returns QUAKING HOUSES VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510527
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 February 2024 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 February 2024 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 May 2023 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 May 2023 91 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 May 2022 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 May 2022 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required