LAKE DISTRICT PARADISE PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1174252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 03 June 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required