Accounts and annual returns THE ASPIRE ACADEMY & TUITION

Charity number: 1175485
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 76 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 76 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 April 2023 436 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 April 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 May 2021 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 February 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 August 2020 194 days late Download Open in new window