SAMARITANS OF PRESTON AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1173718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 1970 AS AMENDED 22 APRIL 1975, 10 MARCH 1983 AND 27 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED ON 01 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN PRESTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND (B) TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
PRESTON AND SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS
Registration history
  • 19 September 1970 : Standard registration