THE LONG SUTTON MEN'S SHED

Charity number: 1175464
Charity reporting is up to date (145 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 June 2021 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 June 2021 145 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 24 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 24 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 03 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 03 November 2018 On time Download