GWENT BEEKEEPERS CIO

Charity number: 1174746
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)