SUMMERHILL ACADEMY FRIENDS

Charity number: 1174667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required