FIRST STEPS FAMILY HUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fun and educational activities for families with children under 5
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,370 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 September 2018: CIO registration
- Chalgrove and Watlington First Steps Family Hub (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER TOPPING | Chair | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Anne Kearney | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Simmie | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Bruce | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL TOPPING | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.05k | £15.80k | £29.55k | £21.84k | £24.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.13k | £11.26k | £18.98k | £24.10k | £22.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.71k | £14.68k | £24.38k | £14.80k | £17.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN UNDER 5 AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN CHALGROVE, WATLINGTON AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHALGROVE CP SCHOOL
HIGH STREET
CHALGROVE
OXFORD
OX44 7ST
- Phone:
- 01865400234
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window