Accounts and annual returns RIVER DEE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1173787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 May 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 May 2024 1214 days late Download Open in new window