Trustees ROTHERHAM SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Francis David Pinder Chair 19 November 2021
None on record
Stephen Wilson Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Mark Smith Trustee 18 May 2021
SHEFFIELD CITIZENS ADVICE AND LAW CENTRE
Received: On time
Kathryn Alice Saunders Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Sheridan Higgs Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
FIONA WILSON Trustee 08 September 2020
ROTHERHAM AND DEARNE VALLEY CIRCUIT
Received: 14 days late
HOLY TRINITY THORPE HESLEY (ANGLICAN & METHODIST)
Received: 125 days late
John Glynn Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
Nicole Lyons Trustee 22 May 2018
None on record
John Sparrow Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record