Accounts and annual returns THE SINO-BRITISH FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1174487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window