ST KORKOS ORTHODOX CHURCH AND ERITREANS' COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1174445
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 March 2021 43 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 October 2020 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 October 2020 255 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 October 2020 614 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 October 2020 614 days late Download