Trustees EASTON JAMIA MASJID
Charity number: 1174320
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL RAOOF MALIK | Chair | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Javaid | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Zia Hussain | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Rashid | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Majid Hussain | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Arif | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chaudhry Naeem Tahir | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Muhamad Yaqub | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Syed Ajaz Shah | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Younis | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ARSHAD MAHMUD | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABBID HUSSAIN YOUNIS | Trustee | 19 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHAHID HUSSAIN AWAN | Trustee | 19 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
ASHRAF HUSSAIN | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.