YEZIDI EMERGENCY SUPPORT (Y.E.S)

Charity number: 1174562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 23 June 2019 On time Download